judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SEAB B. PETERS, ET VIR v. JEFF J. BROOKSHIRE

Case: A-163
A-163
05/01/1944
Application for Writ of Error
SEAB B. PETERS, ET VIR
JEFF J. BROOKSHIRE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/06/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
06/29/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/12/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/11/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/13/1947Letter Filed
05/21/1945Letter Filed
07/06/1944Brief in Support of Petition
07/03/1944Response to Motion filed
06/29/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/16/1944Letter Filed
05/17/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/17/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/17/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/17/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/12/1944Reply to Response
05/11/1944Response to Petition
05/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Seab B. Peters, et virPetitioner
Jeff J. BrookshireRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information