judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANK E. SHERER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0735
Short Caption:FRANK E. SHERER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3307-79Filed Date:05/29/1981

Opening Event Date:05/29/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/18/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/28/1982
Argued/Submitted:02/22/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFrank E. Sherer N
Warren Anthony Fitch YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Michael W. Farrell NN
Cynthia W. Lobo YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SHERER, FRANK E. UNITED STATES
05/29/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/18/1982FiledRecord Completed
12/28/1982FiledBriefing Completed
02/22/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/30/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition