judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNSON (BARRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36200
Short Caption:JOHNSON (BARRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Eureka Co. - Seventh Judicial District - 962Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-09183
07/12/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. called for certificate of service. 00-12014
07/17/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Motion to Extend Time. 00-12352
07/17/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on July 6, 2000, appointingGary D. Fairman as counsel for appellant. 00-12353
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 11, 2000. 00-12354
07/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 12, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. The motion for an extension of time is denied. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement within 20 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with NRAP 3C. 00-12459
07/20/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Trial Testimony Only, November 30, 1999 and December 1, 1999. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 00-12583
08/08/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-13772
08/21/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-14629
08/21/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-14631
10/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. in response to Barry Johnson's Proper Person Letter received on 09/29/00.
10/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-19027
11/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19416
11/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 2000. 00-19416