judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD DEAN ROHDE v. SMITHS MEDICAL, d/b/a SIMS DELTEC, INC., a Minnesota corporation

Case Heading (06-213)
Case Number:06-213Case Docketed On:09/20/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:RICHARD DEAN ROHDE v. SMITHS MEDICAL, d/b/a SIMS DELTEC, INC., a Minnesota corporation
Full Title:RICHARD DEAN ROHDE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. SMITHS MEDICAL, d/b/a SIMS DELTEC, INC., a Minnesota corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard Dean RohdeKatherine Lamere Mead
Bradford S. Mead
AppelleeSmiths MedicalRichard Alan Mincer
Michelle L. Rognlien

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 134
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/20/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/20/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/20/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/20/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/07/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record and brief on CD on 11/09/06BriefAppellantFinal
12/18/2006Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
12/22/2006Event - Phone Call - received call re out-of-state counsel and admission pro hac vice - advised should comply with current admission rulesEventPhone CallFinal
12/22/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2007Motion - Accept late filing - reply brief of appellantMotionAccept late filingFinal
01/17/2007Response/Objection - Motion - appellee's opposition to appellant's motion for leave to file late reply briefResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/19/2007Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Michelle L. Rognlien for appelleeMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
01/23/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Michelle L. RognlienOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
01/25/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes: Volumes I through IV, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
01/30/2007Order - Grant - motion for leave to file late reply brief.OrderGrantFinal
01/31/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/08/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented - argued before full court (Katherine L. Mead for appellant; Richard A. Mincer for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/22/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/07/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/07/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/17/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal