Case: 05-94-00465-CV
05-94-00465-CV
03/21/1994
Temporary Injunction
Texoma Medical Center, ,Inc. d/b/a Texoma Medical Center and
Steven Gary Brannon, CRNA
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2015 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
08/12/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
06/25/1997 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
06/18/1995 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
04/21/1995 | Case stored | | |||
04/21/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |||
04/21/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |||
04/19/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
04/19/1995 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/10/1995 | Response to Motion | | |||
04/07/1995 | Response to Motion | | |||
03/27/1995 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
03/27/1995 | Response to Motion | | |||
03/22/1995 | Motion to Substitute Attorney Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/21/1995 | Motion to Substitute Attorney | | |||
03/15/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
02/28/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Rendered | | ||
02/28/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Rendered | | ||
02/28/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Rendered | | ||
09/14/1994 | Submission | | |||
09/14/1994 | Submitted | | |||
09/14/1994 | Submission | | |||
09/14/1994 | Submitted | | |||
09/08/1994 | Brief Received | | |||
08/11/1994 | MattConv | | |||
06/06/1994 | Letter Filed | | |||
06/03/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/01/1994 | Motion to Advance Case Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
05/31/1994 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/31/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/31/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/27/1994 | Motion for Mediation | | |||
05/27/1994 | Motion to Advance Case Filed | | |||
05/25/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
05/16/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
04/20/1994 | Brief Filed | | |||
03/31/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
03/25/1994 | MattConv | | |||
03/21/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |||
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
03/18/1994 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |||
03/01/1994 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/08/2015 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texoma Medical Center, Inc. D | Appellant | Stacy D. Siegel Orrin L. Harrison, Iii James A. Reeder, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
59th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable Lloyd Perkins
93-1783