Case: 05-94-00466-CV
05-94-00466-CV
03/21/1994
Miscellaneous civil
White, Charles Clinton
Lynda White
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/20/1994 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Case Transferred to Another Court of Appeals | |
04/20/1994 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Case Transferred to Another Court of Appeals | |
04/14/1994 | Motion to Substitute Attorney Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/06/1994 | Letter Filed | | |
04/05/1994 | Response to Motion | | |
03/28/1994 | Appearance of counsel | | |
03/28/1994 | Motion to Substitute Attorney | | |
03/21/1994 | MattConv | | |
03/21/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
03/21/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/27/1994 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
01/20/1994 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/20/1994 | Case Stored | Case archived |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
255th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Donald Koons
94-916-S