Case: 06-94-00069-CV
06-94-00069-CV
03/21/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Floyd, Thelma
Kroger Food Stores
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/28/2002 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
03/10/1995 | Mandate issued | | |
01/24/1995 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction | |
04/26/1994 | Motion Disposed | Overruled | |
03/21/1994 | MOTION FILED | | |
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/10/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Floyd, Thelma | Appellant | Hon. Cindy D. Purinton |
Kroger Food Stores | Appellee | Hon. Craig Nyhus |
Trial Court Information
Honorable Robert Day