Case: D-0369
D-0369
10/08/1990
App Writ of Error
FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH OF LAREDO TEXAS
JULIA VELA VIRJAN and ARTURO VIRJAN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/05/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/09/1990 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
10/08/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/05/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
12/28/1990 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | NO Rehearing Filed 814 SW2d 389 | | |
11/28/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | Writ Denied 814 SW2d 389 | |
10/11/1990 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
10/11/1990 | No description available. | | | |
10/09/1990 | Reply to Response | | | |
10/08/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
12/28/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
VIRJAN, JULIA VELA & ARTURO | Respondent | Mr. Kevin W. Grillo Mr. Robert C. Hilliard |
FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH | Petitioner | Ms. Cathy J. Sheehan Mr. Keith B. O'Connell |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-89-00223-CV
Reversed & Remanded
RULE 90, 07-25-90
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable BLAIR REEVES
Trial Court Information
37th District Court
Bexar
Honorable John J. Specia
86-CI-04025