Case: 04-90-00615-CV
04-90-00615-CV
11/09/1990
Summary Judgment
Karambis, Margaret & Karambis, Jo Ann
Druckenbrodt, Kenneth
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/24/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/24/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/31/1992 | Opinion issued | Affirmed in Part/Reversed & Remanded in Part | |
01/31/1992 | Opinion issued | Affirmed in Part/Reversed & Remanded in Part | |
08/26/1991 | Mot. EOT to file ___________ Disposed | Filing is Moot | |
08/26/1991 | Mot. EOT to file ___________ Disposed | Filing is Moot | |
07/15/1991 | Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed | | |
07/15/1991 | Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed | | |
06/19/1991 | Submitted | | |
06/19/1991 | Submission | | |
06/19/1991 | Submitted | | |
05/13/1991 | Submission | | |
05/07/1991 | Information regarding cause received | | |
04/19/1991 | Brief Filed | | |
04/19/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/19/1991 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
04/19/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/05/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/05/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/25/1991 | Brief Filed | | |
03/25/1991 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
03/25/1991 | Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late) | | |
03/18/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
03/11/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/11/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/01/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
02/12/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Filing is Moot | |
02/12/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Filing is Moot | |
02/12/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Filing is Moot | |
01/31/1991 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/31/1991 | Order Entered | | |
01/31/1991 | Order Entered | | |
01/31/1991 | Order Entered | | |
12/10/1990 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
12/07/1990 | No Description Available. | | |
12/07/1990 | No Description Available. | | |
12/07/1990 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
11/20/1990 | Show cause hearing held | | |
11/09/1990 | No Description Available. | | |
11/09/1990 | No Description Available. | | |
11/09/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/15/1990 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
07/16/1990 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/24/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Kenneth Druckenbrodt | Appellee | Richard P. Corrigan Sr. |
Margaret & Jo Ann Karambis | Appellant | R. Robert Willmann, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
73rd Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
87-CI-08969
N/A