Case: 07-94-00076-CV
07-94-00076-CV
03/21/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Circle Dot Ranch, Inc. & Euline W. Walser
Sidwell Oil & Gas, Inc., et al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/30/2005 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
10/20/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/03/1995 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
04/25/1995 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
04/24/1995 | Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc. | | |
02/21/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
02/08/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
01/26/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
01/26/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
12/12/1994 | Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous) | | |
10/18/1994 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
10/12/1994 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
10/10/1994 | Submitted | | |
10/10/1994 | Submission | | |
10/07/1994 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
09/16/1994 | Submission | | |
06/17/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/17/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
06/14/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
06/13/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
05/17/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
05/04/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
04/18/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
03/22/1994 | Exhibits Filed | | |
03/21/1994 | Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed | | |
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/20/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sidwell Oil & Gas, Inc., Et Al | Appellee | Robert L. Templeton Honorable Steven Ray Emmert Joe W. Hayes |
Circle Dot Ranch, Inc. & Eulin | Appellant | Mitchell G. Ehrlich Robert D. Lemon |
Trial Court Information
31st District Court
Wheeler
Honorable John T. Forbis
9178