Case: 09-94-00123-CR
09-94-00123-CR
03/21/1994
All Misdemeanors
Guidry, Robert
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/09/1995 | MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED | | |
01/09/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/23/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/02/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
11/02/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/02/1994 | Submitted | | |
11/02/1994 | Submission | | |
10/20/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/18/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
09/29/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
08/11/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/05/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/09/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/08/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
05/09/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
05/02/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
03/21/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/09/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Rodney D. Conerly |
Guidry, Robert | Appellant | J. D. Hamm |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Jefferson
Honorable Harold Plessala
173092
20 days in jail; $350 fine