Case: 02-94-00070-CV
02-94-00070-CV
03/21/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Cliber Corporation, The
Neblett, Mike, Individually and d/b/a Neblett and Smith Rental
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/17/2008 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
02/07/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/07/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/23/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/23/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/23/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Granted | | |
10/17/1994 | Motion for Extension for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/17/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
10/11/1994 | Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed | | |
09/14/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/13/1994 | Submitted | | |
06/13/1994 | Submission | | |
05/18/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
05/18/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/18/1994 | Submission | | |
05/17/1994 | Amended Brief Filed | | |
04/22/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
04/22/1994 | Letter | | |
03/21/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/21/1994 | Submission | | |
03/21/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/17/2008 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Neblett And Smith Rental | Appellee | Ronnie L. Phillips |
Neblett, Mike Individually An | Appellee | Ronnie L. Phillips |
Cliber Corporation, The | Appellant | Shawn M. Frazin |
Trial Court Information
Honorable Don R. Windle
CV-91-00489-C