Case: 04-94-00163-CR
04-94-00163-CR
03/21/1994
Robbery
Gregory Dwayne Thomas
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/07/2017 | Internal memo | | |
07/26/2001 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
07/16/2001 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | |
06/20/2001 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | |
05/30/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
05/17/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
05/15/2001 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
05/03/2001 | Petition for Review Filed | | |
04/24/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
04/17/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
04/09/2001 | Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
04/09/2001 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/29/2001 | Letter of Inquiry Filed | | |
02/13/2001 | Motion Filed | | |
02/12/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
02/12/2001 | Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
01/08/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/08/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |
12/13/2000 | Information regarding cause received | | |
06/07/1999 | Letter of Inquiry Filed | | |
11/21/1994 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
11/17/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/17/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/21/1994 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction | |
09/21/1994 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction | |
09/12/1994 | Submitted | | |
09/12/1994 | Submission | | |
09/12/1994 | Submitted | | |
08/18/1994 | Submission | | |
07/11/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
07/11/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/11/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/08/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
06/09/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
05/16/1994 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/16/1994 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/16/1994 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/16/1994 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/05/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
05/05/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
04/21/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
04/19/1994 | Motion Filed | | |
04/11/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/18/1994 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
03/16/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/14/1994 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/07/2017 | Case Stored | Case archived |
11/17/2019 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gregory Dwayne Thomas | Criminal - Appellant | Gregory D. Thomas Alfred Hernandez |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Edward F. Shaughnessy, III |
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mary Dolores Roman
90-CR-4848
Fifteen (15) years