Case: 05-94-00473-CV
05-94-00473-CV
03/22/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Lott, Charles
Dallas Area Rapid Transit
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2015 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
08/12/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
06/25/1997 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
08/03/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/03/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |||
06/01/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||
05/19/1994 | Motion for Extension to File Response - Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/13/1994 | Response to Motion | | |||
05/09/1994 | Motion for Extension to File Response Filed | | |||
04/29/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
04/18/1994 | Mot Ext Time File Record Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
04/18/1994 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Dismissed | | ||
04/18/1994 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Dismissed | | ||
04/08/1994 | Response to Motion | | |||
04/01/1994 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
03/22/1994 | Extend Time to File Record | | |||
03/22/1994 | MattConv | | |||
03/22/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
02/18/1994 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |||
11/23/1993 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/08/2015 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Frank Andrews
92-03552-F