judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOYCE (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36199
Short Caption:JOYCE (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35026 , 35057 , 35659 , 40330 , 40549
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C147187Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/03/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09182
06/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 120 days.The record shall include any previously prepared transcripts. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-10876
07/03/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on June 27, 2000. 00-11296
11/03/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. 00-19385
11/03/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn12[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-06446
05/07/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-06807
05/07/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 10, 2002. 02-06807