judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUBERT NICKLE v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PLATTE COUNTY, STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-128)
Case Number:06-128Case Docketed On:06/09/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:HUBERT NICKLE v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PLATTE COUNTY, STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:HUBERT NICKLE, Appellant (Defendant), v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PLATTE COUNTY, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHubert NickleFrank J. Jones
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Platte County, WyomingMary R. Eikenberry
Eric M. Alden

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 115
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/09/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/09/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/10/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/10/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/29/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/03/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
11/15/2006Response/Objection - Motion to dismissResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/17/2006Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
11/17/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellee (Untimely, brief due 11/15/06)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/22/2006Order - Deny motion to dismiss (and granting extension to file brief)OrderDenyFinal
12/14/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/18/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/04/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/12/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/12/2007Notice-Internal - Other - noted change of county attorney from Eric Alden to Mary R. EikenberryNotice-InternalOtherFinal
07/24/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/09/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/13/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/10/07 by Susan Artery.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal