judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TWYMAN, DIANE UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0734
Short Caption:TWYMAN, DIANE UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1489-79Filed Date:05/06/1981

Opening Event Date:05/06/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/23/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/20/1982
Argued/Submitted:12/02/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TWYMAN, DIANE UNITED STATES
05/06/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/23/1982FiledRecord Completed
09/20/1982FiledBriefing Completed
12/02/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/05/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition