judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXAS v. BOARD OF COUNTY AND DISTRICT ROAD INDEBTEDNESS

Case: A-165
A-165
05/04/1944
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXAS
BOARD OF COUNTY AND DISTRICT ROAD INDEBTEDNESS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/24/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/31/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/15/1944Letter brief Respondent
06/02/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/31/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/31/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
05/17/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/28/1944Response to Motion filed
10/24/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/31/1944Supplemental Brief filed
06/15/1944Letter brief
06/02/1944Supplemental Brief filed
05/31/1944Response to Petition
05/31/1944Brief in Support of Petition
05/17/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
05/04/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXASRelator
Board of County and District Road IndebtednessRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information