judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Moreno, Linda v. Brittany Square Associates, L. P., B. S. Partners, Inc.

Case: 14-94-00273-CV
14-94-00273-CV
03/22/1994
Other Personal Injury
Moreno, Linda
Brittany Square Associates, L. P., B. S. Partners, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/15/1998Case stored
07/09/1998Mandate Issued
07/09/1998Mandate Issued
09/11/1995Record RETURNED from Higher Court
05/08/1995Writ of error DUE
04/28/1995Writ of Error FILED
04/06/1995Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
03/23/1995Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
03/09/1995Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
03/09/1995Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
03/08/1995Submitted
03/08/1995Submission
03/08/1995Submitted
02/09/1995Submission
08/18/1994Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/18/1994Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA
08/05/1994Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief FILED - ANT,APE,APP
08/05/1994Supplement brief RECEIVED-ANT,APE
05/16/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/16/1994Case ready to be set
05/16/1994Case ready to be set
04/21/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/22/1994Transcript FILED
03/22/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/24/1994Bond FILED
01/27/1994Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/09/1998Case StoredCase stored
12/16/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleePaul A. Hoefker
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantJim Alan Adams
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
83,405