Case: 13-94-00144-CV
13-94-00144-CV
03/22/1994
Deceptive Trade Practices Act
Karg, Ronald D. and Billie A. Karg, Trustees of Karg Management Trust
Strickland, Earl B., III, Independent Executor and Trustee of the Estate of Bernadean K. Strickland, Deceased, Robin Strickland, and Bennie C. Strickland
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/22/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/18/1996 | Record returned to Court. | | |
09/12/1996 | Higher Court Decision | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/05/1996 | Cite for opinions | | |
04/29/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
04/29/1996 | Opposition filed | | |
04/09/1996 | Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court | | |
04/04/1996 | Writ Filed | | |
04/04/1996 | Writ of Error Fee Paid | | |
03/28/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Otherwise Disposed | |
03/28/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/28/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/06/1996 | Sworn Statement filed | | |
03/05/1996 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
03/01/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
02/28/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
02/21/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
02/21/1996 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
02/08/1996 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
05/10/1995 | Submitted | | |
05/10/1995 | Submission | | |
04/11/1995 | Submission | | |
02/02/1995 | Entry of Judge Selection for Case. | | |
01/18/1995 | Submission | | |
06/09/1994 | Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSED | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/27/1994 | Motion for leave to file brief | | |
05/20/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
05/20/1994 | Brief received. | | |
05/20/1994 | No oral argument requested | | |
04/28/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/21/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
04/21/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/21/1994 | No oral argument requested | | |
04/13/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
04/13/1994 | Statement of Facts Received | | |
04/13/1994 | Stipulation for Counsel | | |
04/07/1994 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
04/07/1994 | Supplemental transcript filed | | |
04/07/1994 | Sworn Statement filed | | |
04/04/1994 | Green card in | | |
03/31/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
03/31/1994 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
03/31/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
03/31/1994 | Statement Filed | | |
03/31/1994 | Statement of Facts Received | | |
03/28/1994 | 10 day letter sent | | |
03/22/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
03/22/1994 | Transcript Received | | |
03/22/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/22/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Strickland, Earl B. III, Inde | Appellee | Phil Harris Darrell Davis |
Karg, Ronald D. And Billie A. | Appellant | Gary Henrichson |
Trial Court Information
92nd District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Homer Salinas
C-4376-91-A