Case: 05-94-00475-CV
05-94-00475-CV
03/22/1994
Automobile Personal Injury
Valderas, Alex
Ima Jean Pennebaker
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/20/1994 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Case Transferred to Another Court of Appeals | |
04/20/1994 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Case Transferred to Another Court of Appeals | |
04/15/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/22/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
03/22/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/18/1994 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
11/22/1993 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/20/1994 | Case Stored | Case archived |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
93-5076-A