Case: 04-94-00175-CV
04-94-00175-CV
03/21/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Carrillo, Juana
H.E. Butt Grocery Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/22/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/22/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/31/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
07/31/1995 | Motion to Reverse and Remand Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/31/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
07/12/1995 | Motion to Reverse and Remand filed | | |
06/26/1995 | Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedure Sent | | |
06/23/1995 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ No Action Taken | |
06/23/1995 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ No Action Taken | |
06/23/1995 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/23/1995 | Motion to Substitute Counsel Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/23/1995 | Motion to Substitute Counsel Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/23/1995 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/23/1995 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/23/1995 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/23/1995 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/23/1995 | Appeal Reinstated | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Order Entered | | |
06/23/1995 | Appeal Reinstated | | |
06/19/1995 | Affidavit for Motion Filed | | |
06/12/1995 | Motion Filed | | |
05/31/1995 | Information regarding cause received | | |
05/31/1995 | Information regarding cause received | | |
05/25/1995 | Motion Filed | | |
05/25/1995 | Motion Filed | | |
05/23/1995 | Motion to Substitute Counsel Filed | | |
05/04/1994 | Order Entered | | |
05/04/1994 | Order Entered | Abated | |
05/04/1994 | Order Entered | Abated | |
05/04/1994 | Order Entered | Abated | |
05/04/1994 | Order Entered | Abated | |
05/04/1994 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
05/04/1994 | Order Entered | Abated | |
05/04/1994 | Order Entered | Abated | |
04/04/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
04/04/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
04/04/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/22/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/21/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/21/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/21/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/21/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/16/1994 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
01/18/1994 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/22/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The Texas Property & Casualty | Appellee | |
Intervenor | Appellee | Peter M. Kreisner |
Juana Carrillo | Appellant | Albert Villegas Peter M. Kreisner |
H.E. Butt Grocery Company | Appellee | Wallace B. Jefferson Wade B. Shelton |
Trial Court Information
37th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raul Rivera
90-CI-00214
N/A