Case: 08-01-00257-CR
08-01-00257-CR
07/05/2001
Burglary
Walker, Michael Joe, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
07/05/2001
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |||
02/12/2003 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |||
02/12/2003 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Refused | | ||
01/17/2003 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Refused | | ||
10/16/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review | | |||
10/08/2002 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |||
09/30/2002 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |||
09/30/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review | | |||
09/03/2002 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/03/2002 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/25/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
05/23/2002 | Submitted | | |||
05/23/2002 | Submission | | |||
05/23/2002 | Submitted | | |||
05/20/2002 | Filed waiver of oral argument | | |||
05/20/2002 | Filed waiver of oral argument | | |||
04/12/2002 | Submission | | |||
03/20/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
03/20/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/20/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/01/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
03/01/2002 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/15/2002 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
01/25/2002 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/25/2002 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
12/14/2001 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/14/2001 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
12/04/2001 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |||
10/26/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
10/26/2001 | Reporter/Recorder's Record filed | | |||
09/28/2001 | Inquiry to Clerk/Reporter Regarding No Record | | |||
07/27/2001 | Docketing Statement Received | | |||
07/05/2001 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||
07/05/2001 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||
06/06/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/07/2003 | Case Stored | Court has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
WALKER, MICHAEL | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Terri Hamby |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. William T. Hill Hon. Grace E. Shin |
JOE PHILLIPS, COURT REPORTER | Court reporter | Joe Phillips |
KAREN GREENE, JUDGE | Trial Court Judge | Hon. Karen J. Greene |
JIM HAMLIN, DISTRICT CLERK | Trial court clerk | Jim Hamlin |
Trial Court Information
282nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable John W. Greene
F-0039856-SMS
10 yrs IDTDCJ $500 fine