Case: A-6962
A-6962
07/28/1958
Application for Writ of Error
SKELLY OIL COMPANY
GERTRUDE L. ARCHER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/25/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
08/06/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/28/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/27/1958 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/25/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/15/1958 | Opinion issued | | ||
08/06/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/28/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
07/28/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gertrude L. Archer, et al. | Respondent | |
Skelly Oil Company | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information