Case: 03-99-00257-CR
03-99-00257-CR
05/14/1999
Robbery
Derrick Lindsey
The State of Texas
No
4th Court of Appeals
05/14/1999
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/20/2001 | Case stored | | |||||
06/15/2000 | Brief received, not filed | | |||||
11/19/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
11/12/1999 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
08/26/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
08/19/1999 | Submitted | | |||||
08/19/1999 | Submission | | |||||
07/05/1999 | Submission | | |||||
07/01/1999 | Mt to Withdraw as attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/25/1999 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
06/23/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
06/22/1999 | Letter received | | |||||
06/21/1999 | Mt to Withdraw as attorney filed | | |||||
06/21/1999 | Frivolous brief filed | | |||||
06/07/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
06/02/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
05/14/1999 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||||
05/14/1999 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||||
04/27/1999 | No Description Available. | | |||||
04/21/1999 | No Description Available. | | |||||
04/21/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
03/16/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||
03/16/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/19/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Alan E. Battaglia The Honorable Susan D. Reed |
Lindsey, Derrick | Appellant | Mr. Derrick Lindsey Mr. Vincent D. Callahan |
Trial Court Information
226th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sid L. Harle
98CR5097
25 yrs.