Case: A-6941
A-6941
07/07/1958
Application for Writ of Error
EDWARD C. JAMES AND CONSO REALTY COMPANY
EAGLE ROCK RANCH, C. B. SMITH, ROBERT W. DRYE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/28/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/05/1958 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
11/25/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
11/05/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
11/01/1958 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
08/05/1958 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
07/24/1958 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
07/23/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/17/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/07/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/05/1959 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
01/28/1959 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
01/28/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/14/1959 | Concurring Opinion issued. | | ||
01/14/1959 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/05/1958 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/25/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
11/05/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
11/01/1958 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
10/01/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/01/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/01/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/01/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/01/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/05/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
07/24/1958 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
07/23/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/17/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/07/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/07/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
C. B. Smith | Respondent | |
Eagle Rock Ranch | Respondent | |
Edward C. James and Conso Realty Company | Petitioner | |
Robert W. Drye, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information