judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

BERNICE COUCH, ET VIR v. GERTRUDE M. GILLESPIE

Case: A-6936
A-6936
07/03/1958
Application for Writ of Error
BERNICE COUCH, ET VIR
GERTRUDE M. GILLESPIE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
11/28/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/11/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
07/03/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
10/09/1959Letter Filed
05/25/1959Order from Lower Court filed
11/28/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/11/1958Response to Petition
07/03/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/03/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bernice Couch, et virPetitioner
Gertrude M. GillespieRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information