Case: A-6937
A-6937
07/03/1958
Application for Writ of Error
NETTIE EDNA WOMBLE
LEE ATKINS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/27/1960 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/10/1959 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
05/27/1959 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
05/12/1959 | Post submission brief filed | Respondent | | |
05/01/1959 | Post submission brief filed | Petitioner | | |
03/16/1959 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
03/05/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
09/19/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
09/15/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
09/15/1958 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
08/04/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/03/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/05/1960 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/27/1960 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/13/1960 | Opinion issued | | ||
06/10/1959 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
05/27/1959 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
05/12/1959 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
05/04/1959 | Hearings Record filed | | ||
05/01/1959 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
04/01/1959 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/16/1959 | Reply to Response | | ||
03/13/1959 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/05/1959 | Motion for Rehearing | Filing granted | | |
09/19/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
09/15/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
09/15/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
08/04/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/03/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/03/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Lee Atkins, et al. | Respondent | |
Nettie Edna Womble | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information