Case: A-6961
A-6961
07/28/1958
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS AND DALLAM COUNTY
FEDERAL LAND BANK OF HOUSTON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/22/1959 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
03/02/1959 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
09/05/1958 | Supplement to Petition filed | Petitioner | | |
08/04/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/28/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/09/1959 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
12/09/1959 | Opinion issued | | ||
09/22/1959 | Response to Petition | | ||
03/02/1959 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
01/28/1959 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
09/05/1958 | Supplement to Petition filed | | ||
08/04/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/28/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/28/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas and Dallam County | Petitioner | |
Federal Land Bank of Houston | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information