Case: A-6970
A-6970
07/30/1958
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. KATE M. GIBSON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTIVE UNDER THE WILL OF S. W. GIBSON, DECEASED, ET AL.
W. H. SHOOK, AHMITTIE (MINNIE) WATSON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/19/1958 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
11/10/1958 | Brief in Support of Petition | Respondent | | |
11/06/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
10/02/1958 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
09/15/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/30/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/19/1958 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/10/1958 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
11/06/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/02/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
09/15/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/08/1958 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Filing granted | | |
07/30/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
07/30/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
W. H. Shook | Respondent | |
Ahmittie (Minnie) Watson, et al. | Respondent | |
Mrs. Kate M. Gibson, individually and as Independent Executive under the Will of S. W. Gibson, deceased, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information