judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLLINS (LEROY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34695
Short Caption:COLLINS (LEROY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9801006AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/22/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07750
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34695, 34779, 34796. 99-09635
12/22/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/22/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-13052
06/15/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn9[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-10025
07/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10421
07/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2001. 01-10421