judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBBIE HEYWOOD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-150)
Case Number:06-150Case Docketed On:06/28/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ROBBIE HEYWOOD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBBIE HEYWOOD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobbie HeywoodD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Geoffrey Gunnerson
Mackenzie Williams
Eric Alan Johnson
Brian J. Hunter

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 149
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/28/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/28/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/11/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/25/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/25/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/09/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
12/13/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
01/25/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/29/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/13/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/13/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/27/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
04/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Mackenzie Williams and Geoffrey Gunnerson, Student Interns, to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Donna DomonkosNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/23/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, jury instructions and verdict; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, exhibits; Volume V, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Donna D. Domonkos for appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Brian J. Hunter, Student Intern, to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
06/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Brian J. Hunter, Student Intern for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
06/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Donna D. Domonkos, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Eric A. Johnson, Director, PAP, and Brian J. Hunter, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Hunter for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/19/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part and remanding. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/05/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/10/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Date stamped 10/09/07.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal