judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

D. L. ROSE v. MABEL MCDANIEL, ET AL.

Case: A-6980
A-6980
08/07/1958
Application for Writ of Error
D. L. ROSE
MABEL MCDANIEL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/13/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/12/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/02/1958Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/22/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
08/15/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
08/07/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/13/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/12/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/02/1958Response to Petition
08/22/1958Response to Petition
08/15/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/07/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/07/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mabel McDaniel, et al.Respondent
D. L. RosePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information