Case: 12-02-00197-CR
12-02-00197-CR
07/15/2002
Delivery of a Controlled Substance
Vincent David Revill
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/14/2007 | Record returned. | | |||
06/27/2007 | Record checked out by counsel of record. | | |||
06/27/2007 | memorandum to file | | |||
06/19/2007 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |||
03/07/2007 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |||
03/07/2007 | memorandum to file | | |||
01/18/2005 | Clerk's Acknowlegement of Mandate | | |||
01/14/2005 | Case stored | | |||
01/14/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |||
01/10/2005 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |||
12/30/2004 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | | ||
12/01/2004 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | | ||
09/23/2004 | ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT | | |||
09/21/2004 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |||
09/21/2004 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |||
08/20/2004 | Ext to file PDR disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/19/2004 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||
07/20/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||
07/07/2004 | motion for rehearing filed | | |||
06/23/2004 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
02/17/2004 | Submitted | | |||
01/27/2004 | Letter to Submit w/o Argument | | |||
04/03/2003 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
03/21/2003 | Prescreened | | |||
03/19/2003 | Motion for Leave to File Late Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/17/2003 | Brief Filed | | |||
03/17/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/17/2003 | Brief Received | | |||
03/17/2003 | Motion for Leave to File Late Brief | | |||
03/13/2003 | memorandum to file | | |||
02/06/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/29/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
12/11/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/27/2002 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
10/24/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
09/25/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/23/2002 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
08/28/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/22/2002 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
08/14/2002 | Motion to Substitute Attorney Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/09/2002 | Supp Record Filed (show in remarks by: CLK or RPT) | | |||
08/07/2002 | Docketing Statement | | |||
08/01/2002 | Docketing Statement | | |||
08/01/2002 | Motion to Substitute Attorney Filed | | |||
07/26/2002 | Notice for Criminal Docketing Statement | | |||
07/24/2002 | Reporters Record Filed | | |||
07/23/2002 | Notice of No Record Received | | |||
07/15/2002 | Welcome to the court letter | | |||
07/15/2002 | Clerks Record Filed | | |||
07/15/2002 | Notice of appeal received | | |||
04/17/2002 | Motion For New Trial filed in trial court | | |||
04/15/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
04/15/2002 | Motion For New Trial filed in trial court | | |||
03/21/2002 | Date Sentence Given in Open Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/14/2005 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
01/14/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Ms. Sue Korioth Mr. Douglas E. Lowe |
Revill, Vincent David | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Gary A. Udashen |
Trial Court Information
3rd District Court
Anderson
Honorable Bascom W. Bentley
25822
45 Years/TDCJ-ID