Case: A-6989
A-6989
08/14/1958
Application for Writ of Error
ANNA RAMM, ET AL.
ESTATE OF JOE RAMM, DECEASED, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/12/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
09/25/1958 | Response to Reply filed | Respondent | | |
09/16/1958 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
08/14/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/14/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/18/1958 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/12/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
09/25/1958 | Response to Reply filed | | ||
09/16/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
08/14/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/14/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
08/14/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Estate of Joe Ramm, deceased, et al. | Respondent | |
Anna Ramm, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information