Case: A-6988
A-6988
08/14/1958
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
ROBERT BRUCE EVANS
TONI EVANS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/23/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Respondent | | |
08/14/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Petitioner | | |
08/14/1958 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
08/14/1958 | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed | Petitioner | | |
08/14/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/15/1958 | Motion to dismiss | | ||
10/27/1958 | Miscellaneous Motion | Filing granted | | |
10/23/1958 | Motion to dismiss | | ||
10/23/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
08/22/1958 | Bond | | ||
08/19/1958 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
08/19/1958 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
08/14/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
08/14/1958 | motion for leave to file petition | Filing granted | | |
08/14/1958 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
08/14/1958 | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed | Filing granted | | |
08/14/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Toni Evans, et al. | Respondent | |
Robert Bruce Evans | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information