judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BREEN (DONALD) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34696
Short Caption:BREEN (DONALD) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - C791547Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/21/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07767
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34429, 34579, 34587, 34683, 34696, 34700, 34713, 34762. 99-09648
10/21/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 10/20/99. 99-10301
10/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Having reviewed the record on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief, and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15274
09/26/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15442
09/26/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 28, 2000. 00-15442