judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONMICHAEL GUY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-151)
Case Number:06-151Case Docketed On:06/29/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JONMICHAEL GUY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JONMICHAEL GUY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJonMichael GuyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 56
Citation:184 P.3d 687

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/29/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/29/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/29/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/03/2006Motion - Other, for leave to file pro se briefMotionOtherFinal
08/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/17/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/22/2006Order - Denying motion to file pro se supplemental briefOrderDenyFinal
09/25/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/25/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/15/2006Order - Grant - third extension of time, no further extensions consideredOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
12/01/2006Motion - Remand to district court for evidentiary hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel and for a stay of briefingMotionRemand to district courtFinal
12/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant, fourth requestMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/13/2006Order - Grant - extension of time, no further extensions will be consideredOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/19/2006Order - Remand - Calene (60 days to hold hearing)OrderRemand - CaleneFinal
02/05/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other, Decision letter after completion of remand hearing.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
02/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Resuming briefing scheduleNotice-OutgoingResuming briefing scheduleFinal
03/12/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
04/26/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina KerinNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James Michael CauseyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts, Cassette Tape, and Pre-Sentence Investigation Report; Volume III, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
06/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; James Michael Causey, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/06/2008Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
06/06/2008Brief - Petitioner in support of petitionBriefPetitionerFinal
06/19/2008Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
06/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/19/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal