judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LUC BITJAD V. DC DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH

Case Information: 10-AA-0736
Short Caption:LUC BITJAD V. DC DEPARTMENT OF HEALTHClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:06/22/2010

Opening Event Date:06/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/24/2013Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/16/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLuc Bitjad NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of HealthN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/22/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (This is NOT OAH).
06/22/2010FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
06/23/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD/DEPARTMENT & Todd Kim, Esq.
05/24/2013FiledRecord On Appeal
05/24/2013FiledRecord Completed
06/04/2013FiledBriefing Order
07/26/2013FiledOrder -directing motion, brief & appendix
08/23/2013FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
08/23/2013FiledDismissed
09/16/2013FiledMandate