judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GARDINER, WAYNE A. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 84-CV-0985
Short Caption:GARDINER, WAYNE A. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA14955-83Filed Date:07/17/1984

Opening Event Date:07/17/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/15/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/15/1985
Argued/Submitted:07/01/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Arthur M. Reynolds YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GARDINER, WAYNE A. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
07/17/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/15/1984FiledRecord Completed
03/15/1985FiledBriefing Completed
07/01/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/31/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition