judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IRWIN (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 37229
Short Caption:IRWIN (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43235
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C131899Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/16/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/02/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-00020
01/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 37206, 37207, 37228, 37229, 37232, 37240, 37258, 37259, 37278. 01-01355
05/16/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-08114
05/16/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/05/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are not warranted in this matter. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn10[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-02028
03/04/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-02101
03/04/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/17/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 6, 2003. 03-02101