judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BEDARD (SCOTT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 37237
Short Caption:BEDARD (SCOTT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47646 , 50609
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C145855Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/09/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/02/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 01-00072
02/12/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-02807
02/20/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. To date, appellant has failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are necessary. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellant's counsel. On February 12, 2001, appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on February 12, 2001. 01-03100
02/20/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-02808
03/05/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/17/00, 4/6/00, 8/24/00, 8/31/00, 9/5/00, 9/6/00, 9/7/00, 9/8/00, 9/11/00, 9/12/00, 9/13/00 and 11/30/00. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. Filed in district court on: no file-stamp. 01-03927
05/02/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-07411
05/07/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed May 2, 2001. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before June 18, 2001. 01-07539
06/20/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second). 01-10368
07/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Despite the procedural deficiency, we elect to treat the transcript request form filed on March 5, 2001, as a request for certified transcripts.To date, Ms. Prawalsky has not filed the transcripts requested of her. Ms. Prawalsky shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file certified copies of the requested transcripts. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcripts, Ms. Prawalsky shall, within the same time period, file a motion with this court requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, Ms. Prawalsky shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 01-12166
07/23/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Shirlee Prawalsky regarding July 17, 2001, order. 01-12460
07/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 23, 2001, court recorder Prawalsky submitted a letter to this court informing the court that she had not received any request for preparation of transcripts and that transcripts for the proceedings below were prepared and filed in the district court on a daily basis during those proceedings. In light of the information provided by court recorder Prawalsky, we hereby vacate that part of our July 17, 2001, order directing court recorder Prawalsky to file transcripts with this court. Further, we admonish counsel for appellant for not carefully following the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure and caution counsel that such future procedural derelictions may result in the imposition of sanctions. On June 20, 2001 appellant filed a motion requesting a second extension of time to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We grant that motion. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 15 days from the date of this order. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed under the provisions of NRAP 31(a)(1).No further extensions of time shall be permitted except upon demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-12731
08/06/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request). 01-13247
08/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. In light of the short amount of time requested, and in the interest of judicial economy, we grant appellant's third motion for extension of time filed on August 6, 2001. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by August 23, 2001. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). We remind counsel that briefs may only exceed thirty pages with permission of this court. Accordingly, if the opening brief exceeds 30 pages, counsel for appellant should file an appropriate motion. 01-14186
08/27/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 08/23/01. 01-14417
08/27/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 01-14418
09/25/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-16152
09/25/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-16153
10/23/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 8, 2001. 01-17818
11/19/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. 01-19365
04/09/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-06232
04/09/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
06/12/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Young, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 43. SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 02-10185
07/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-10600
07/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 24, 2002. 02-10600