Case Information: 37238 | |||
Short Caption: | PECANAC (MLADEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFP997597 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/08/2001 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/02/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/02/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). | 01-00076 | |
01/10/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/9/00; 10/24-10/26; and 6/1/00. To Court Reporter: Christian Knox. | 01-00552 | |
01/16/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-00879 | |
01/18/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Docketing Statement). | 01-01144 | |
01/24/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 01-01566 | |
02/12/2001 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Proceedings: 06/01/00; 06/02/00; 06/06/00 through 06/09/00; 06/12/00; and 10/24/00 through 10/26/00. Court Reporters: Christian M. Knox and Polly Stipke. | 01-02746 | |
04/23/2001 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 04/20/01. | 01-06849 | |
04/23/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 01-06851 | |
05/07/2001 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 05/03/01. | 01-07549 | |
10/08/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. | 01-16835 | |
10/08/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/06/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Having considered Pecanac's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, we 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 01-20438 | |
01/02/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-20769 | |
01/02/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 4, 2002. | 01-20769 |