Case Information: 82-CV-0132 | |||
Short Caption: | AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY T/ASMITH, ROBERT JONNIS | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA7311-81 | Filed Date: | 01/19/1982 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/19/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 03/01/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 07/02/1982 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/20/1982 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY T/A FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COS. SMITH, ROBERT JONNIS T/A BOB SMITH ELEC. TUNEUP CTR | |||
01/19/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
03/01/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/02/1982 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
10/20/1982 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
02/13/1984 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |