judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Paul Miles Sullivan v. The State of Texas

Case: 03-98-00151-CR
03-98-00151-CR
03/10/1998
Intoxication Manslaughter
Paul Miles Sullivan
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
12/20/2001Case stored
11/16/1999Mandate Issued
11/15/1999Case returned from higher court
10/20/1999Peition for Review disposed in Supreme CourtRefused
10/20/1999Peition for Review disposed in Supreme CourtRefused
06/29/1999Case forwarded to higher court
06/18/1999Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
05/20/1999Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/13/1999Motion for rehearing filed
04/29/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/26/1999Submitted
03/26/1999Submission
03/23/1999Oral argument waiver received
03/23/1999Oral argument waiver received
03/03/1999Oral argument waiver received
03/03/1999Oral argument acknowledged
02/26/1999Submission
02/17/1999Case ready to be set
01/27/1999Brief filed
12/14/1998Brief filed
11/18/1998Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/12/1998Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/30/1998Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/28/1998Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/27/1998Reporter's Record Filed
05/26/1998Notice received
05/26/1998Motion to Substitute DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/1998Mt to Withdraw as attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/22/1998Motion to Substitute Filed
05/22/1998Mt to Withdraw as attorney filed
05/20/1998Notice of no Court Reporter's Record Recd or Filed
05/19/1998Clerk's Record Received
05/19/1998Transcript & SF Filed
05/12/1998Clerk's Record Overdue
04/13/1998Docketing statement received
04/09/1998Amended notice of appeal filed
03/25/1998Reporter's Record Received
03/10/1998Notice of Appeal Filed
03/10/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/16/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Arthur C. "Cappy" Eads
Mr. James T. Russell
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Administrative Judicial JudgeRegional Administrative JudgeThe Honorable B. B. Schraub
Sullivan, Paul MilesAppellantMr. Keith S. Hampton
Trial Court Information
27th District Court
Bell
Honorable Joe Carroll
47,303
5 yrs./$5000 fine