judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KELLY, BENJAMIN H. EPSTIEN, ROBIN

Case Information: 82-CV-0112
Short Caption:KELLY, BENJAMIN H. EPSTIEN, ROBINClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4075-80Filed Date:02/05/1982

Opening Event Date:02/05/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/21/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/15/1982
Argued/Submitted:02/09/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KELLY, BENJAMIN H. EPSTIEN, ROBIN
02/05/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/21/1982FiledRecord Completed
12/15/1982FiledBriefing Completed
02/09/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/14/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition