Case: 02-01-00295-CR
02-01-00295-CR
07/12/2001
Indecency with a Child
Jody Martin Maxwell
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/17/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/17/2003 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
02/28/2003 | Order Entered | | |
02/12/2003 | Petition for Review Disposed in Higher Court | Refused | |
12/27/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |
12/23/2002 | Letter | | |
11/27/2002 | Order Entered | | |
10/08/2002 | Response Filed | | |
09/23/2002 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
08/23/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |
08/08/2002 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/20/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/15/2002 | Submitted | | |
04/15/2002 | Submission | | |
04/15/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/15/2002 | Brief Filed | | |
02/28/2002 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/28/2002 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
01/15/2002 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/15/2002 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
01/14/2002 | Amended Brief Filed | | |
01/14/2002 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/14/2002 | Other Document Received | | |
01/08/2002 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
01/08/2002 | Amended Brief Received | | |
12/17/2001 | Brief Filed | | |
12/12/2001 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/11/2001 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
09/11/2001 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/07/2001 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
08/14/2001 | Letter | | |
08/13/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
08/08/2001 | Reporter's Record Not Received | | |
08/06/2001 | Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed | | |
08/06/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
07/26/2001 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
07/12/2001 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/17/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles M. Mallin |
Maxwell, Jody Martin | Criminal - Appellant | Kenneth N. Cutrer |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Matthew W. Paul Michael Casillas Charles M. Mallin |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable L. Clifford Davis
0757679D
Ct#2 - 35 yrs. IDTDCJ