judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MORRIS, CHARLES P. PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL

Case Information: 82-CV-0182
Short Caption:MORRIS, CHARLES P. PROVIDENCE HOSPITALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA9449-81Filed Date:01/29/1982

Opening Event Date:01/29/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/23/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/20/1982
Argued/Submitted:01/20/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Mark J. Brice YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
William J. Murphy YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORRIS, CHARLES P. ET AL PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL
01/29/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/23/1982FiledRecord Completed
09/20/1982FiledBriefing Completed
01/20/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/31/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition