Case: B-2997
B-2997
10/13/1971
Application for Writ of Error
BILL GRAHAM, ET AL.
RAFAEL FRANCO, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/22/1972 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
11/22/1972 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
06/27/1972 | Appendix Filed | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/31/1972 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/16/1972 | Letter brief | Respondent | | |
02/17/1972 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
11/05/1971 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
10/13/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
10/13/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/22/1972 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/22/1972 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/08/1972 | Opinion issued | | ||
06/27/1972 | Appendix Filed | | ||
03/31/1972 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/20/1972 | Miscellaneous letter | | ||
03/16/1972 | Letter brief | | ||
02/17/1972 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
01/26/1972 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
01/26/1972 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/05/1971 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/13/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
10/13/1971 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
10/13/1971 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rafael Franco, et ux. | Respondent | |
Robert B. Thornton | Amicus Curiae | |
Bill Graham, et al. | Petitioner | |
Jim Kronzer and Tom H. Davis | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information