judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURKETT (THEODORE) VS. STATE C/W 34706, 35637

Case Information: 32273
Short Caption:BURKETT (THEODORE) VS. STATE C/W 34706, 35637Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:32273*, 34706 , 35637 Related Case(s): 34706 , 38086
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C52477Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/02/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/01/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
05/20/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to Proceed in Proper Person. (Original and 2 copies--one copy returned.)
07/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certifited copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32252, 32271, 32273, 32275, 32284, 32305, 32312, 32315.
11/02/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
11/02/1998Other Other. Case Submitted on the Record on Appeal this day.
11/02/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/23/2000Other Other. Received proper person Motion to Expedite Appeal. (Received original and two copies-one copy returned).
08/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn5[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 32273, 34706, 35637. 00-14265
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14491
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14491